judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JENCKES (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32315
Short Caption:JENCKES (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C71029Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/18/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. 00-09008
05/08/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
05/29/1998Other Other. Received proper person Motion for the Appointment of Counsel (Received the original only).
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certifited copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32252, 32271, 32273, 32275, 32284, 32305, 32312, 32315.
11/18/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2.
11/18/1998Other Other. Case Submitted on the Record on Appeal this day.
11/18/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We conclude that the district court did not err and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14264
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14471
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14471