judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREGORY DAN RODEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-204)
Case Number:06-204Case Docketed On:09/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:GREGORY DAN RODEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GREGORY DAN RODEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGregory Dan RodenRobert T. Moxley
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jessica Schneider

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 200
Citation:173 P.3d 369

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/01/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/11/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief - appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/12/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/29/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief - appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/30/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/07/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/19/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief - appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/23/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/09/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/12/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/24/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
04/24/2007Event - Phone Call to Attorney General, advised the Court needs a consent and approval for Jessica SchneiderEventPhone CallFinal
05/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - reply briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/08/2007Order - Grant - extension of time to file reply brief.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/18/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
05/18/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
05/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/23/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Robert T. MoxleyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Jessica Schneider to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting. Jessica Schneider will present argument on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/01/2007Order - Oral argument - amending schedule (moved from 8/15/07 to 8/16/07.OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
08/01/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
08/16/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Robert T. Moxley for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Jessica Schneider, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Schneider for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/17/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/07/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal