judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MILLER, WARREN A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0501
Short Caption:MILLER, WARREN A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Lead:81-CF-0501Consolidated: 81-CV-0517
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5271-78Filed Date:04/09/1981

Opening Event Date:04/09/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/01/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/31/1983
Argued/Submitted:09/06/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Noel F. Danto YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MILLER, WARREN A. UNITED STATES
04/09/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/01/1981FiledRecord Completed
05/31/1983FiledBriefing Completed
09/06/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/12/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition