judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2921
B-2921
08/19/1971
Application for Writ of Error
GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE COMPANY, RECEIVER OF SHARPSTOWN STATE BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/01/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/29/1971Letter brief Respondent
09/21/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/13/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
08/19/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/01/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/29/1971Letter brief
09/21/1971Reply to Response
09/13/1971Response to Petition
08/19/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/19/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Federal Deposit Insurance Company, Receiver of Sharpstown State BankRespondent
Great American Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information