judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES (ROBERT) VS. STATE C/W 37388

Case Information: 37448
Short Caption:JONES (ROBERT) VS. STATE C/W 37388Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 37388 *, 37448Related Case(s): 37388 , 51295 , 51296 , 52608 , 55603 , 57463
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 07C043949Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-03131
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. 01-04396
03/29/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on February 20, 2001. (Received from Clark County District Attorney.) 01-05504
03/30/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 20, 2001. 01-05548
11/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn14[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB. Nos. 37388/37448. 01-19601
12/18/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19956
12/18/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2001. 01-19956