judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CASTRO (AARON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34686
Short Caption:CASTRO (AARON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39760
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149055Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/27/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-07733
09/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to file Docketing Statement and Request for Transcript. 99-09315
10/01/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Document: The docketing statement and certificate of no transcript request provisionally submitted on September 17, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-09419
10/01/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-08838
10/01/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-08839
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. 99-09570
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on September 8, 1999. 99-10074
12/10/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 18, 2000. 99-12416
01/18/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 1/17/00. 00-00713
01/18/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Appendix, due 10 days.
01/21/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-01003
01/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Appellant's Appendix. 00-01287
02/22/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 29, 2000. 00-02728
03/01/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-03209
03/30/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 1, 2000. 00-05124
05/01/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 4/28/00. 00-07056
05/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The briefs of both parties imporperly cite to parts of the district court record that are not before this court. Accordingly, both counsel for appellant the the State shall have 20 days from the date of this order to correct the above-noted defects or show cause why this court should not impose sanctions for failure to adhere to this court's rules of appellate procedure. fn1[We note that correction of the defective citations in appellant's opening brief may require the filing of a motion for leave to file a corrected brief. ] 00-07688
05/25/2000Other Other. Returned, unfiled, with letter, six volumes of transcripts from law firm of Kerr & Associates with instructions to cover and label them as appendices.
05/26/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Joint Supplemental Appendix Pursuant to NRAP 30. 00-08930
05/30/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-09081
06/02/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix, Volumes 1 through 6. 00-09305
06/07/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy (Transcripts). 00-09619
06/15/2000BriefFiled Amended Brief. Amended Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 6/14/00. 00-10201
06/15/2000BriefFiled Amended Brief. Amended Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 6/14/00. 00-10202
06/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-10945
06/27/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/26/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . We affirm appellant's conviction." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. 01-01783
02/21/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-01817
02/21/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2001. 01-01817