judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALAN BLANTON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0090)
Case Number:S-07-0090Case Docketed On:04/24/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:ALAN BLANTON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ALAN BLANTON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAlan BlantonRobert T. Moxley
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Jurisdiction, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 27
Citation:178 P.3d 410

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/24/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/24/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Other that record has been supplemented to include Drug Court RecordNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/07/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/26/2007Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
07/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/01/2007Motion - Accept late filingMotionAccept late filingFinal
08/09/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder; Volume IV, drug court record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/21/2007Order - Other - granting leave to file late briefOrderOtherFinal
08/22/2007Motion - Withdrawal of recordMotionWithdrawal of recordFinal
08/22/2007Order - Other - allowing withdrawal of recordOrderOtherFinal
09/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Other. Received copy of motion to correct or modify record and proposed order for the District Court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
09/20/2007System - Record checked-in. Received record back from Attorney General.SystemRecord checked-inFinal
09/20/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/28/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/08/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
10/10/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
10/15/2007Event - Phone Call - Received call from clerk of district court - she indicated that she has portions of the additional record ready, but not the transcript from circuit court. She will send as soon as she has everything.EventPhone CallFinal
10/17/2007Motion - Withdrawal of recordMotionWithdrawal of recordFinal
10/17/2007Order - Granting withdrawal of court record, notify counsel for appellee when record receivedOrderGrantFinal
10/19/2007Record - Supplemental record on appeal, volume V, audio recordings. Pursuant to motion and order to correct or modify record filed in District Court.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
10/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/29/2007Record - Supplemental record on appeal, volume VI, transcripts of volume V.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/11/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/27/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/27/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/31/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/27/08 by Amanda J. Baumhaer.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal