judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOANNE BLUE V. PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL

Case Information: 10-AA-0726
Short Caption:JOANNE BLUE V. PROVIDENCE HOSPITALClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES971-10Filed Date:06/18/2010

Opening Event Date:06/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/01/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJoanne Blue YPro SeN
RespondentProvidence HospitalN
Eric W. GundersonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/18/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
06/18/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
07/07/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to June 18, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
07/07/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
07/15/2010APPEARANCE of Eric W. Gunderson as counsel on behalf of Providence Hospital.
12/16/2010RECORD ON APPEAL w/5/27/10 hearing
12/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/04/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 21, 2010, directing petitioner to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of petitioner and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
02/23/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's brief (was returned for: no cert. of service on brief; no MPLB; and no appdx)
03/23/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 4, 2011, directing petitioner to submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that petitioner has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this petition for review is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
03/23/2011WithdrawnDISMISSED
03/25/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
03/25/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Joanne Blue 4403 Clermont Dr., NE Washington,DC 20011 202 455-3403
04/14/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion to reinstate the petition for review, and it appearing that this matter was dismissed for petitioner's failue to file the brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall submit the brief and limited appendix within 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the denial of petitioner's motion to reinstate. It is F/O that petitioner's motion to reinstate is hereby held in abeyance pending further order of this court. (ETW)
05/17/2011RECEIVED - pet brief. (no signature or cert of serv--returned 5/19/11)
06/02/2011RECEIVED (BRIEF)
06/02/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's appdx (attached to brief)
06/22/2011ORDER GRANT PETITIONER MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix. It is F/O that respondent's breif shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
06/22/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
06/22/2011APPENDIX
07/22/2011FiledBrief w/appdx (Respondent)
07/22/2011FiledBriefing Completed
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/12/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Easterly, McLeese, Steadman
10/09/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Judges Easterly, McLeese, Steadman)
11/01/2012FiledMandate