Case: 07-01-00375-CV
07-01-00375-CV
09/14/2001
Injunction
Anderson Chemical Company, Inc.
Art Green, Individually, and Alpha Labs, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/25/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||||||
12/11/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
12/10/2001 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||||||
12/04/2001 | Submitted | | |||||||
11/08/2001 | Submission | | |||||||
11/07/2001 | Reply brief filed | | |||||||
10/19/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
10/19/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||||||
10/19/2001 | Brief received | | |||||||
09/28/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||||||
09/28/2001 | Brief received | | |||||||
09/26/2001 | Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous) | Overruled | | ||||||
09/25/2001 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||||
09/21/2001 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||||
09/14/2001 | Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous) | | |||||||
09/14/2001 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||||||
09/14/2001 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/25/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
05/28/2002 | Retention | Case will be permanently retained |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Anderson Chemical Company, Inc. | Appellant | Dan C. Dargene Michael E. Coles |
Art Green, Individually, and Alpha Labs, Inc. | Appellee | Mark W. Harmon Cecil Kuhne |
Trial Court Information
72nd District Court
Lubbock
Honorable J. Blair Cherry
01-514,900