Case: A-10829
A-10829
06/04/1965
Application for Writ of Error
EDYTHE WESTERFIELD BELL
GLENN STILL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/07/1966 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
11/09/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/11/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/04/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/18/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
02/07/1966 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
11/18/1965 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
11/09/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
07/21/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/11/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/04/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
06/04/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Glenn Still | Respondent | |
Texas National Bank of Commerce of Houston, Bank of the Southwest National Association and Houston Bank and Trust Company | Amicus Curiae | |
Edythe Westerfield Bell | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information