Case: A-10830
A-10830
06/04/1965
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
TOM D. EASLY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/01/1965 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
11/30/1965 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
10/15/1965 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | Respondent | | |
08/12/1965 | Amended Petition | Petitioner | | |
06/14/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/04/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/15/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/01/1965 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
11/30/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
10/15/1965 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | | ||
10/06/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/12/1965 | Amended Petition | Filing granted | | |
06/14/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/04/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/04/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Petitioner | |
Tom D. Easly, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information