Case: A-10782
A-10782
05/10/1965
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT S. CALVERT, STATE COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
BRITISH AMERICAN OIL PRODUCING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/13/1965 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
12/13/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
12/10/1965 | Response to Reply filed | Petitioner | | |
12/10/1965 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
12/08/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
12/08/1965 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
12/06/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
12/01/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
06/01/1965 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
05/25/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/10/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/13/1965 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
12/13/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
12/10/1965 | Response to Reply filed | | ||
12/10/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
12/08/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
12/08/1965 | Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed | | ||
12/06/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
12/06/1965 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/01/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/17/1965 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
11/17/1965 | Opinion issued | | ||
06/09/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/09/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/01/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
05/25/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/10/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/10/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TEXAS POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY | Amicus Curiae | |
British American Oil Producing Company | Respondent | |
Houston Lighting and Power Company | Amicus Curiae | |
Robert S. Calvert, State Comptroller of Public Accounts | Petitioner | |
SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information