Case: A-10819
A-10819
05/31/1965
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF BIG SPRING
BOARD OF CONTROL OF THE STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/25/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/29/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
07/05/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
06/07/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/31/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/1967 | Letter Filed | | ||
07/25/1966 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/29/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/15/1966 | Dissenting opinion issued. | | ||
06/15/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
07/28/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/05/1965 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/07/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/31/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/31/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Committee of Texas City Attorneys Association | Amicus Curiae | |
City of Big Spring | Petitioner | |
Board of Control of the State of Texas, et al. | Respondent | |
Texas City Attorneys Association | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information