judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMIJANEL BOYD-ODOM v. RYAN LEWIS

Case Heading (S-07-0089)
Case Number:S-07-0089Case Docketed On:04/23/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:TIMIJANEL BOYD-ODOM v. RYAN LEWIS
Full Title:TIMIJANEL BOYD-ODOM, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. RYAN LEWIS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimijanel Boyd-OdomTony S. Lopez
AppelleeRyan LewisWilliam Mather McKellar
Erin Freeman MacLean

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/23/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/23/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/23/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no attachments to NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
04/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/23/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appeal (attachments)OrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
05/30/2007System - Status check - other - contacted counsel for appellant regarding overdue sanction. Assistant will send check today.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
06/06/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOA; payment received eight days lateFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
06/12/2007Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
06/28/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal