judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALEX ST. JAMES V. ADA R. PENA, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-0725
Short Caption:ALEX ST. JAMES V. ADA R. PENA, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7305-06Filed Date:06/07/2010

Opening Event Date:06/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/29/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlex St. James NPro SeN
AppelleeAda R. Pena N
Samuel J. Deblasis, IINN
AppelleeAda Travel Services Inc.N
Samuel J. Deblasis, IINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED. See DC Code 11-721 (2001);... (BY: ETW)
07/20/2010TMC - OTSC
09/07/2010 ORDERED that this appeal is hereby DISMISSED AS PREMATURELY FILED. See DC Code 11-721 (2001) (KRSTFA) (rm)
09/07/2010DISMISSED
09/29/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived