judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD TRAINMEN INSURANCE DEPARTMENT OF CLEVELAND, OHIO v. CORNELIUS GREEN

Case: A-156
A-156
04/26/1944
Application for Writ of Error
BROTHERHOOD OF RAILROAD TRAINMEN INSURANCE DEPARTMENT OF CLEVELAND, OHIO
CORNELIUS GREEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/23/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/06/1944Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/04/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/26/1944Response to Motion filed
10/23/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/06/1944Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/24/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/04/1944Response to Petition
04/26/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/26/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cornelius GreenRespondent
Brotherhood of Railroad Trainmen Insurance Department of Cleveland, OhioPetitioner
Locomotive Engineers Mutual Life and Accident Insurance Association, et al.Amicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information