Case: A-10816
A-10816
05/31/1965
Application for Writ of Error
W. GUY DRAPE, ET AL.
MAX GOCHMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/10/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | Respondent | | |
03/03/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
12/10/1965 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
11/29/1965 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
11/12/1965 | Post submission brief filed | Respondent | | |
06/09/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/31/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/04/1966 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/10/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
03/03/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/16/1966 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/10/1965 | Reply to Response | | ||
11/29/1965 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
11/12/1965 | Post submission brief filed | | ||
07/07/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/09/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/31/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/31/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
W. Guy Drape, et al. | Petitioner | |
Max Gochman | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information