Case: A-11472
A-11472
05/16/1965
Application for Writ of Error
WYLIE E. CASTEEL, H. M. TARGETT, ET AL., E. W. MORRIS
THOMAS C. GUNNING, JR., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/16/1966 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
06/10/1966 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
05/27/1966 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/16/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
05/16/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/16/1966 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
06/10/1966 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
06/10/1966 | Motion to Withdraw Filed | | ||
05/27/1966 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/16/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
05/16/1966 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
05/16/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
H. M. Targett, et al. | Petitioner | |
Thomas C. Gunning, Jr., et al. | Respondent | |
E. W. Morris | Petitioner | |
Wylie E. Casteel | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information