Case: A-10795
A-10795
05/17/1965
Application for Writ of Error
PERRY R. BASS, HOWELL E. SMITH AND JOHN B. CONNALLY, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF ESTATE OF S. W. RICHARDSON, DECEASED
ARANSAS COUNTY INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
03/11/1966 | Amended motion for rehearing | Petitioner | | |
01/17/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/18/1965 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/17/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/21/1966 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/11/1966 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
03/11/1966 | Amended motion for rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/10/1966 | Letter Filed | | ||
01/17/1966 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
06/18/1965 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/17/1965 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
05/17/1965 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Aransas County Independent School District, et al. | Respondent | |
Perry R. Bass, Howell E. Smith and John B. Connally, Independent Executor of Estate of S. W. Richardson, deceased | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information