judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5032
A-5032
12/28/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF HOUSTON
EDWARD W. HRUSKA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/27/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/16/1955Amended Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent
01/26/1955Response to PetitionRespondent
12/28/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/27/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/21/1955Motion to Withdraw Filed
10/12/1955Dissenting opinion issued.
10/12/1955Opinion issued
03/16/1955Amended Response to Petition for Review filed
02/16/1955Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1955Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1955Response to Petition
01/19/1955Additional Copies received
12/29/1954Letter Filed
12/28/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/28/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of HoustonPetitioner
Edward W. HruskaRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information