Case Information: 84-CV-1131 | |||
Short Caption: | DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CORON, THOMAS A. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Torts |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA12588-77 | Filed Date: | 08/15/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/15/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/06/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/13/1985 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/16/1986 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Thomas Anthony | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA ET AL CORON, THOMAS A. | |||
08/15/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/06/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/13/1985 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/16/1986 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/01/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |