judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURTON VS. STIMAC

Case Information: 34237
Short Caption:BURTON VS. STIMACCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46727
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A366366Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/28/1999 / Macnabb, MarySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/23/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/20/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Leavitt Sully & Rivers--check no. 4322.
05/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-04159
05/28/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Leavitt, Sully & Rivers.
05/28/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Frank J. Cremen on cross-appeal--check no. 13587.
05/28/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 99-04445
05/28/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
05/28/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Mary Macnabb. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/01/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-04490
06/01/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 2, 1999. (Transcript will be included in Appendix to Opening Brief). 99-04491
06/03/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
06/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Cross-Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 6/3/99. 99-04795
06/09/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. from Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 99-04849
09/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 13, 1999 at 4:00 p.m. 99-08253
10/25/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 29, 1999. 99-10427
11/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 19, 1999. 99-10958
12/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-12037
01/13/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The court shall forthwith conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal and cross appeal. Appellants/cross-respondents: 100 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-00580
03/21/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 3/20/00. 00-04521
03/21/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-04525
04/21/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 27, 2000. 00-06467
05/01/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Answering Brief and Opening Brief of Richard A. Stimac, Barbara L. Stimac and Kay A. Rodriguez, Respondents and Cross-Appellants. Mailed on: 4/27/00. 00-07053
05/31/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellants/Cross-Respondents' Reply Brief. Mailed on: 05/30/00. 00-09129
10/30/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. 00-19123
02/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 9, 2001, at 11:00 a.m. (NNP01A-MS/RR/DA)
03/12/2001MotionFiled Motion. 01-04398
03/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Rescheduling. We grant respondents' motion to continue the oral argument. We vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for April 9, 2001, at 11:00 a.m., and direct the clerk to schedule this appeal for oral argument before the Northern Nevada Panel in June, 2001. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 01-05287
04/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 11, 2001 at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP01A-MS/RR/DA)
05/22/2001MotionFiled Motion. (with attached stipulation) 01-08568
05/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Setting for Submission. This appeal is currently scheduled for oral argument on June 11, at 10:30 a.m., before the Northern Nevada Panel. On May 22, 2001, appellants/cross-respondents filed a motion to reschedule oral argument. We have determined that the oral argument of this appeal is not warranted. We grant the motion in part, and hereby vacate the oral argument currently scheduled in this matter. We deny the motion in as much as it requests that oral argument be rescheduled. This matter shall stand submitted on the briefs filed herein. 01-08638
05/23/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-15138
10/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15351
10/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/23/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2001. 01-15351