Case: 01-95-00195-CV
01-95-00195-CV
02/21/1995
Damages
Downs, Damon
Kyle, Jack
No
4th Court of Appeals
03/10/1995
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/24/1995 | Brief Due | | |
03/24/1995 | Record due | | |
03/10/1995 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
03/10/1995 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
02/27/1995 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
02/21/1995 | Transcript filed | | |
02/21/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/23/1995 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/10/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
KYLE, JACK | Appellee | J. Lee Haney |
Downs, Damon | Criminal - Appellant | Damon Downs |
Trial Court Information
278th District Court
Walker
Honorable JERRY A. SANDEL
18,959-C