judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BLUE CROSS & BLUE SHIELD GROUP HOSPITALIZATION

Case Information: 84-CV-1186
Short Caption:BLUE CROSS & BLUE SHIELD GROUP HOSPITALIZATIONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 84-CV-1141 Consolidated:84-CV-1186
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4630-84Filed Date:08/23/1984

Opening Event Date:08/23/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/31/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/19/1986
Argued/Submitted:09/10/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Paul F. Kilmer NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Douglas B. Henderson YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Lisa Mariorenzi-Musco NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
James H. Wallace YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
G. Cabell Busick YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles J. Steele YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLUE CROSS & BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION ET AL GROUP HOSPITALIZATION ET AL
01/01/1906 HENDERSONDO FOR BLUE CROSS OF VA INCS. MUSCOL FOR BLUE CROSS & BLUE SHIELD THIELBARL PRO HAC VICE FOR ARG BC/BS OWENM PRO HAC VICE FOR ARG BC/BS WALSHJ PRO HAC VICE (BC/BS OF VA)
08/23/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/31/1986FiledRecord Completed
05/19/1986FiledBriefing Completed
09/10/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/31/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition