judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5018
A-5018
12/20/1954
Application for Writ of Error
HOWARD CARNEY, SECRETARY OF STATE, ET AL., JOHN BEN SHEPPERD, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS
SAM HOUSTON UNDERWRITERS, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/27/1955Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/20/1955Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/07/1955Response to PetitionRespondent
12/20/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/27/1955Response to Brief filed
04/26/1955Miscellaneous Motion
04/20/1955Supplemental Brief filed
04/20/1955Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed
01/07/1955Response to Petition
12/20/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/20/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sam Houston Underwriters, Inc., et al.Respondent
John Ben Shepperd, Attorney General of TexasPetitioner
Howard Carney, Secretary of State, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information