Case Information: 82-CV-0310 | |||
Short Caption: | GULLO, JACK A. LAMBERT, BRUCE E. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA9220-81 | Filed Date: | 02/22/1982 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/22/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 03/31/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/04/1982 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/05/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Bruce E. Lambert | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | GULLO, JACK A. LAMBERT, BRUCE E. ET AL | |||
02/22/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
03/31/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/04/1982 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
01/05/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
01/18/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |