Case Information: 34234 | |||
Short Caption: | DOUGLAS (STEPHEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C77546 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/20/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/20/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-04150 | |
05/20/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
10/21/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn2[The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Chief Justice, participated in the decision of this matter in place of the Honorable Myron E. Leavitt, Justice]. NNP99B-RR/CY/DA | 99-10289 | |
11/16/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-11311 | |
11/16/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/03/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 1999. | 99-11311 |