judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WELDON, ANTHONY E. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0608
Short Caption:WELDON, ANTHONY E. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4941-79Filed Date:04/27/1981

Opening Event Date:04/27/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/18/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/22/1983
Argued/Submitted:07/07/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Donald R. Gratehouse NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WELDON, ANTHONY E. UNITED STATES
04/27/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/18/1982FiledRecord Completed
04/22/1983FiledBriefing Completed
07/07/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/15/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition