judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FARRAR (ALBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32350
Short Caption:FARRAR (ALBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C77509Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/25/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/14/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
06/08/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Proper person motion for leave.
07/16/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Entry of written judgment or order and record on appeal. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to : (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. The clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court. The clerk of the district court shall, within 120 days from the date of this order, transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
07/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. A certified copy of the order denying defendant's pro per motion for evidence hearing and transport order and order denying defendant's pro per motion to vacate judgment of conviction. Filed in the district court May 21, 1998.
08/03/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Proper person appellant's pro per opening brief. (Received the original and 2 copies- 1 returned to appellant.)
08/03/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Proper person appendix to appellant's pro per opening brief. (Received original only.)
11/25/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (Copy.)
11/25/1998Other Other. Submitted for decision on record.
11/25/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[ We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-17349
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17453
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17453