judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAHN TRAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0087)
Case Number:S-07-0087Case Docketed On:04/19/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:HAHN TRAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:HAHN TRAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHahn TranDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/11/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
06/12/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/12/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal