Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/18/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Smith & Harmer--check no. 2228. | | |
05/18/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 99-04042 |
05/24/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 6/20/97 and Entry of Order for Order filed 10/9/98. Due Date: 10 days | | |
05/26/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 99-04366 |
05/27/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry R. Hicks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | | |
05/27/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: October 20, 1998. | | 99-04414 |
06/02/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 99-04586 |
07/08/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Ronald J. Logar withdraws as co-counsel for appellant. Julian C. Smith remains as counsel. | | 99-06071 |
07/12/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Service by Mail. | | 99-06213 |
07/13/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. | | |
07/28/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Sharon McDonald withdraws as counsel for respondent. | | 99-06853 |
08/12/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 99-07478 |
09/22/1999 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | | 99-09013 |
11/24/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 3, 2000. | | 99-11792 |
12/29/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of time to file Opening Brief. (Second Request). | | 99-13353 |
01/06/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before January 24, 2000. | | 00-00184 |
01/24/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of time to file Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 00-01129 |
01/26/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Opening brief and appendix due: February 7, 2000. | | 00-01252 |
02/07/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages; and to Include Copies of Two Transcripts without File Stamps in Appendix. | | 00-01907 |
02/25/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the 57-page opening brief and the appendix provisionally received on February 7, 2000. | | 00-03034 |
02/25/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: hand delivered 02/07/00. | | 00-01910 |
02/25/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 7. | | 00-01911 |
03/07/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Hardy & Woodman, and David A. Hardy. | | 00-03604 |
03/07/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 21, 2000. | | 00-03605 |
03/07/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Partially Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief and Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. | | 00-03606 |
03/17/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to "Motion to Partially Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief and Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule." | | 00-04245 |
04/24/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 00-06518 |
05/08/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before May 31, 2000. | | 00-07484 |
05/25/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Modify Stay Order Pending Appeal. | | 00-08850 |
05/26/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent moved to dismiss the appeal in part for lack of jurisdiciton, to strike the appellant's opening brief, and to suspend the briefing schedule until this motion is resolved. We have reviewed the motion and the opposition and conclude that the motion lacks merit. We deny the motion. | | 00-08912 |
06/01/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Respondent's Motion to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. | | 00-09250 |
06/02/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Motion for an Extension of Time in which to File Response to Motion to Modify Stay Order Pending Appeal. | | 00-09306 |
06/15/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. On June 1, 2000, respondent filed a motion for leave to file a brief in excess of thirty pages. The fifty seven-page answering brief and the appendix provisionally submitted on June 1, 2000, shall be filed forthwith. On June 2, 2000, respondent file a motion for an extension of time to file a response to appellant's "motion to modify stay order pending appeal." Respondent shall file a response to that motion within 10 days from the date of this order. | | 00-10200 |
06/15/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 00-09252 |
06/15/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | | 00-09254 |
06/28/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Response in Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Modify Stay Order Pending Appeal and Motion to Dissolve Stay Order Pending Appeal. | | 00-11067 |
07/07/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dissolve Stay Order Pending Appeal. | | 00-11559 |
07/13/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 15, 2000. | | 00-12133 |
08/07/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 00-13640 |
08/09/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Appellant shall have to and including September 15, 2000, to serve and file the reply brief. | | 00-13802 |
09/14/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 00-16280 |
09/18/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time, to and including September 30, 2000, to file and serve the reply brief. No further extensions of time will be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | | 00-16374 |
10/02/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 50 pages. | | 00-17284 |
10/02/2000 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/02/00. | | 00-17287 |
10/02/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. | | 00-17288 |
03/07/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motions. We deny appellant's motion to modify the stay, or in the alternative, for a reduction in the amount of the bond. We deny respondent's motion to dissolve the stay. | | 01-04136 |
09/05/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | | 01-14962 |
09/05/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. NNP02-MS/RR/NB | | |
11/13/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | | 01-18882 |
12/11/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 01-19480 |
12/11/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
01/18/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. | | 01-19480 |