Case Information: 34197 | |||
Short Caption: | LAY (KEVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C100994 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/31/2000 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/13/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/13/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-03904 | |
05/28/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 99-04463 | |
06/01/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 5/28/99. | 99-04492 | |
06/04/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (for certificate of no transcript request). | 99-04666 | |
07/13/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order due: 30 days. | 99-06248 | |
07/30/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: June 4, 1999. | 99-06980 | |
07/30/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: June 11, 1999. | 99-06982 | |
09/07/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to file a Late Request for Transcripts & Motion for Extension of Time to file Appellant's Opening Brief. | 99-08347 | |
09/30/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, serve and file a transcript request form and shall, within 45 days serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). No further extensions shall be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | 99-09362 | |
10/12/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 99-09831 | |
11/17/1999 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 11/16/99. | 99-11387 | |
11/29/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to file Appellant's Appendix to the Opening Brief. | 99-11814 | |
12/03/1999 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. The appellant's appendix to the opening brief, provisionally submitted on November 22, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. | 99-12119 | |
12/03/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 23. | 99-11639 | |
12/21/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 36 pages. | 99-12954 | |
12/21/1999 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. | 99-12955 | |
12/21/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 99-12956 | |
01/20/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 28, 2000. | 00-00909 | |
01/31/2000 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 1/28/00. | 00-01514 | |
01/31/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/19/2000 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded for retrial." Before Rose, Young and Becker, JJ. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 126. SNP00A-1-RR/CY/NB | 00-22102 | |
01/16/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-22137 | |
01/16/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/20/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2001. | 00-22137 |