Case Information: 34212 | |||
Short Caption: | CLARK COUNTY VS. ISRAEL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A365607 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Becker | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/27/1999 / Christensen, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/17/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/17/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-03988 | |
05/17/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Becker. Peremptory challenge in district court. | ||
05/19/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. March 29, 1999 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Kris Johnson. | 99-04085 | |
05/27/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
06/02/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-04563 | |
07/06/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 7/23/99. | 99-05934 | |
08/05/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 99-07201 | |
08/05/1999 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 99-07202 | |
08/25/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs. | 99-07942 | |
08/25/1999 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |