Case Information: 34206 | |||
Short Caption: | BRYANT (WILLIAM) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34319 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C130190 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 99-03949 | |
05/17/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
05/26/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days from the date of this order. | 99-04370 | |
06/09/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 99-04851 | |
06/09/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-04852 | |
06/09/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 99-04853 | |
07/12/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML | 99-06179 | |
08/09/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-07299 | |
08/09/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/19/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 1999. | 99-07299 |