judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2879
B-2879
07/23/1971
Application for Writ of Error
STRUCTURAL METALS, INC., ET AL.
GROVER IMPSON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/10/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/10/1972Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/15/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/08/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/05/1971Response to PetitionPetitioner
08/04/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
07/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/18/1972Opinion issued
08/21/1972Response to Motion filed
08/10/1972Motion for Rehearing
07/26/1972Opinion issued
02/10/1972Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/15/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/08/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/05/1971Response to Petition
08/04/1971Response to Petition
07/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/23/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/23/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grover Impson, et al.Respondent
Jerry V. Walker, Arno W. Krebs, Jr. and Hugh E. HackneyAmicus Curiae
W. James KronzerAmicus Curiae
Robert L. TempletonAmicus Curiae
Structural Metals, Inc., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information