judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MABIN, PENNY L. HOWARD UNIVERSITY

Case Information: 84-CV-1133
Short Caption:MABIN, PENNY L. HOWARD UNIVERSITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA13636-82Filed Date:08/16/1984

Opening Event Date:08/16/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/26/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/07/1985
Argued/Submitted:04/24/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard P. Thornell NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Frederick B. Abramson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Judy B. Chase NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MABIN, PENNY L. HOWARD UNIVERSITY
01/01/1906 SPICERD PRO HAC VICE FOR ARGUMENT
08/16/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/26/1984FiledRecord Completed
01/07/1985FiledBriefing Completed
04/24/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/24/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/22/1988LETTER TO APPEALS COORDINATOR & ATTYS RETURNING EXHIBITS: 1 LARGE BROWN ENVELOPE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD