Case Information: 34198 | |||
Short Caption: | LUTTRELL VS. LUTTRELL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 31095 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D191448 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/17/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/13/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/13/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-03905 | |
05/24/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 99-04279 | |
06/17/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Vols. 4 and 5. | 99-05303 | |
06/17/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. NNP | ||
08/18/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
09/20/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for the Supreme Court to Reconsider Forma Pauperis Application of the Appellant. Nos. 31095, 34198. | 99-08919 | |
03/02/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from her. We deny all unresolved motions as moot.] Nos. 31095, 34198. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-03274 | |
04/17/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 31095, 34198 | 00-06079 | |
05/03/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 5 and 6. | 00-07190 | |
05/03/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/26/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2000. | 00-07190 |