Case: A-5025
A-5025
12/22/1954
Application for Writ of Error
SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY
JIMMIE M. ROBINSON
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/15/1955 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/22/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/1955 | Letter Filed | | ||
05/04/1955 | Opinion issued | | ||
03/15/1955 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/23/1955 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/22/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
12/22/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SEARS, ROEBUCK AND COMPANY | Petitioner | |
Jimmie M. Robinson | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information