Case Information: 34215 | |||
Short Caption: | NEWSTED (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41369 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140134 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/17/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/17/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-04026 | |
06/01/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB | 99-04497 | |
06/29/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-05690 | |
06/29/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 1999. | 99-05690 |