Case: 14-90-00951-CV
14-90-00951-CV
10/24/1990
Contract
Turboff, Jerald A., Trustee
Gross, Jenard M.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/24/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/24/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/09/1992 | Writ of Error DISPOSED | DENIED | |
07/20/1992 | Writ of Error FILED | | |
06/18/1992 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
06/11/1992 | Motion to publish opinion DISPOSED | GRANTED | |
06/05/1992 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/27/1992 | Motion to publish opinion FILED | | |
05/21/1992 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
05/21/1992 | Opinion issued | REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
12/23/1991 | Post submission brief FILED - ANT,APE | | |
12/20/1991 | Post submission brief FILED - ANT,APE | | |
12/04/1991 | Submitted | | |
12/04/1991 | Submission | | |
12/04/1991 | Submitted | | |
11/22/1991 | Reply Brief Filed | | |
11/04/1991 | Submission | | |
05/17/1991 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/17/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/17/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/02/1991 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
04/17/1991 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/27/1991 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/07/1991 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
02/19/1991 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/25/1991 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
01/03/1991 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
12/20/1990 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
11/08/1990 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
10/24/1990 | Transcript FILED | | |
10/24/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/22/1990 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
08/27/1990 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/24/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | Robert M. Roach, Jr. |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | Ronald E. Cook |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Dennis G. Herlong |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | Hon. Solace H. Kirkland |
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable RUSSELL T. LLOYD
87-50975