Case: B-4734
B-4734
06/25/1974
Certified Question from the U. S. Court of Appeals
ALLRIGHT, INC.
ROY LEE ELLEDGE, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/15/1974 | Appellant's Brief filed | | ||
07/12/1974 | Appellees' Brief filed | | ||
06/25/1974 | Certified Question filed | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/24/1974 | Opinion issued | | ||
07/15/1974 | Appellant's Brief filed | | ||
07/12/1974 | Appellees' Brief filed | | ||
07/02/1974 | Letter Filed | | ||
06/25/1974 | Certified Question filed | | ||
06/25/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Allright, Inc. | Appellant | |
Roy Lee Elledge, Jr. | Appellee |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information