Case: 01-02-00595-CR
01-02-00595-CR
06/04/2002
Anders brief filed
Comer, Derrick Deahaun
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/14/2003 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |||
05/16/2003 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
04/04/2003 | Extension of time to file PDR disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals. | Grant motion | | ||
03/15/2003 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
03/07/2003 | Correspondence | | |||
02/28/2003 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||
02/28/2003 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |||
02/13/2003 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
02/04/2003 | Submitted | | |||
01/24/2003 | Exhibits filed | | |||
01/24/2003 | Order entered | Otherwise disposed | | ||
01/13/2003 | Reset submission date | | |||
01/07/2003 | Case set for submission no oral argument | | |||
12/28/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||
12/08/2002 | Brief Due | | |||
11/08/2002 | Brief Due | | |||
10/21/2002 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | | ||
10/03/2002 | Correspondence | | |||
09/24/2002 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||
09/24/2002 | Motion to withdraw as counsel disposed - no new attorney to substitute in as counsel | Motion will be taken with case | | ||
09/24/2002 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | | ||
09/04/2002 | Waiver | | |||
08/30/2002 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |||
08/30/2002 | Motion to withdraw as counsel filed - no new attorney to substitute in as counsel | | |||
08/30/2002 | Correspondence | | |||
08/30/2002 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |||
08/30/2002 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
08/29/2002 | Brief Due | | |||
07/30/2002 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |||
07/27/2002 | Record due | | |||
07/09/2002 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |||
06/04/2002 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |||
05/28/2002 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||
05/28/2002 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/14/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Comer, Derrick Deshaun | Criminal - Appellant | Derrick Deshaun Comer Stephen Christopher Taylor |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Charles A. Rosenthal, Jr. William J. Delmore III |
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
Honorable Elsa Alcala
909568
Life TDC