Case: B-4704
B-4704
06/12/1974
Application for Writ of Error
DA-COL PAINT MANUFACTURING COMPANY
AMERICAN INDEMNITY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/08/1974 | Letter brief | Petitioner | | |
11/04/1974 | Letter brief | Respondent | | |
08/14/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
08/14/1974 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
06/19/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/12/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/1974 | Opinion issued | | ||
11/08/1974 | Letter brief | | ||
11/04/1974 | Letter brief | | ||
10/02/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/02/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/02/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/02/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/02/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
10/02/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
08/14/1974 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
08/14/1974 | Motion for leave to file brief | | ||
08/14/1974 | Reply to Response | | ||
06/19/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/12/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
06/12/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
AMERICAN INDEMNITY COMPANY | Respondent | |
Da-Col Paint Manufacturing Company | Petitioner | |
Gayle E. Oler | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information