Case: B-4706
B-4706
06/12/1974
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
EVA FLORES GONZALEZ, AS NEXT FRIEND OF ROSA GONZALEZ, A MINOR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/13/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
09/25/1974 | Letter brief | Petitioner | | |
06/27/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/12/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/13/1974 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/10/1974 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
09/30/1974 | Letter Filed | | ||
09/25/1974 | Letter brief | | ||
06/27/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/12/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
06/12/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Employers Insurance Association | Petitioner | |
Eva Flores Gonzalez, as Next Friend of Rosa Gonzalez, a minor | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information