Case: PD-1129-99
PD-1129-99
07/12/1999
PDR Case Type
WEAVER, LARRY D.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/2020 | MISC DOCUMENT FOR A PDR | NO LEGAL ADVICE GIVEN |
| ||||
11/05/2012 | COPY REQUEST | | |||||
10/08/1999 | FINAL DISP | Refused | | ||||
09/22/1999 | PDR DISP | Refused | | ||||
09/22/1999 | PDR DISP | Refused | | ||||
08/12/1999 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |||||
07/12/1999 | PDR FILED | | |||||
07/12/1999 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/14/1999 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | William C Sowder |
WEAVER, LARRY D. | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Kim Hayes LARRY D. WEAVER |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-98-00046-CR
AFF 5-26-99
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
364th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Bradley S. Underwood
97-425172