judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MIMS (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34700
Short Caption:MIMS (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40237
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR95P1758Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/27/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07823
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34429, 34579, 34587, 34683, 34696, 34700, 34713, 34762. 99-09649
10/27/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 10/26/99. 99-10543
10/27/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/27/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn17[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-10810
07/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10857
07/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/30/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 28, 2001. 01-10857