judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAREN CRAYK, f/k/a KAREN GLOVER v. CARL GLOVER

Case Heading (S-07-0094)
Case Number:S-07-0094Case Docketed On:04/26/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:KAREN CRAYK, f/k/a KAREN GLOVER v. CARL GLOVER
Full Title:KAREN CRAYK, f/k/a KAREN GLOVER, Appellant (Defendant), v. CARL GLOVER, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKaren CraykJohn J. Metzke
AppelleeCarl GloverDonald A. Cole

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 14
Citation:176 P.3d 645

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/26/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/26/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/13/2007Brief - Appellant, received copy on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
07/31/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/01/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/20/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/21/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/29/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
02/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/26/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/26/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/29/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal