judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHANTEL MAPP V. WACHOVIA BANK, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-0741
Short Caption:CHANTEL MAPP V. WACHOVIA BANK, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 10-CV-0368 Consolidated: 10-CV-0527 , 10-CV-0741
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR2216-09Filed Date:06/14/2010

Opening Event Date:06/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/25/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/17/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChantel Mapp NPro SeN
AppelleeWachovia BankN
Dwayne L. GarrettNY
AppelleeElizabeth Zajic N
Dwayne L. GarrettNY
AppelleeWarren Taylor NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/16/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to reinstate appeals nos. 10-CV-368 and 10-CV-527, and to consolidated with appeal no. 10-Cv-741, the opposition thereto, and it appearing that appeals nos. 10-CV-368 and 10-CV-527 were dismissed for appellant's failure to file the statement regarding transcript, and it further appearing that transcript is needed for appeal no. 10-CV-741. It is ORDERED that appellant's motion to reinstate appeal is granted and appeals nos. 10-CV-368 and 10-CV-527 are hereby reinstated. It is (MORE)
08/16/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion to consolidate is granted and appeal no. 10-CV-741 is consolidated with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-Cv-368 and 10-CV-527 for all purposes herein. It is (MORE)
08/16/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order complete and filed with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be presented with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to response to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (ETW) elp
08/27/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 3/24/10) (elp)
08/27/2010STATEMENT- of aplt's statement of issues (whether trial court erred in granting Wachovia Bank's summary judgment) (elp)
09/01/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS aplt Granted
09/20/2010 On consideration of the motion of B. Marian Chou, Esquire, to withdraw here appearance as counsel of record for appellant, and it appearing that appellant has been notified by the Court Reporting Division of the Superior Court that the transcripts requested for this appeal have been prepared and are ready for transmittal to this court, it is ORDERED that the motion of B. Marian Chou, Esquire, is granted and her appearance is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for appellant. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise the court within 20 days from the date of this order as to the identity of new counsel, or whether appellant intends to proceed on appeal pro se. Failure to comply with this order shall result in appellant being deemed as proceeding on appeal pro se. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, file a notice showing that appellant has paid for the transcript and attach a copy of the receipt to the notice. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
09/27/2010MISCELLANEOUS - aple's designation of additional transcripts to be ordered (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 5/14/10) *appellee is requesting appellant to order the transcript above. (elp)
10/08/2010APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to 9/20/10 order re status of counsel and transcripts.
10/22/2010RECORD INDEX all cases
10/25/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (76-pgs/tape 3/24/10 proc.)w/cd
10/25/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
11/09/2010TMC - appellant's motion to stay - oppo
11/15/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to motion to stay (Wachovia Bank, N.A.)
11/18/2010 ORDERED that APPELlANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S BRIEF remains due on or before December 6, 2010. (RDBRNW) (rm)
12/01/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 40 days (opp) (elp)
12/10/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Brief.
12/16/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix, and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before January 18, 2011. (ETW) elp
01/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/18/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
02/17/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/17/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/25/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
03/17/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
04/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that appellee Warren Taylor's brief was due to be filed with this court on February 22, 2011, but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee Warren Taylor shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief or a statement that the party will not be filing a brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or statement, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject these appeals to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on the appellate briefs on file. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted to the extent that appellant's reply brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC) elp
04/14/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of June 2011 through Sept 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by APR. 22, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
04/19/2011LETTER - from aple (Warren Taylor) stating that he will not be filing a brief in the appeal case
04/25/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (Mapp)
05/04/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
05/25/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE - aplt's reply to aple's brief
06/16/2011 On consideration of appellee Wachovia Bank and Elizabeth Zajic's motion to strike appellant's reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is hereby held in abeyance and referred to the merits panel upon assignment. (ETW) elp
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/14/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
10/21/2011FiledOrder Denying aple's motion to strike.
10/21/2011FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt motion for oral argument.
11/01/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Fisher, Pryor
11/16/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge)
11/16/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)
12/01/2011LodgedOpposition to motion to supp the record (motion for leave needed) (Appellee Wachovia Bank)
12/01/2011FiledMotion to have opinion and judgemnet reconsidered (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledOrder Denying as moot aplt's motion to supplement the record.
12/12/2011FiledMandate
01/23/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se motion for reconsideration
07/23/2020 ERROR - (RE-USE)