judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ALPINE TELEPHONE CORPORATION v. W. D. MCCALL, ET AL.

Case: A-138
A-138
04/15/1944
Application for Writ of Error
ALPINE TELEPHONE CORPORATION
W. D. MCCALL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/29/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/31/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/25/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
04/15/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/01/1945Letter Filed
08/09/1945Motion to Withdraw Filed
07/21/1945Letter Filed
12/07/1944Response to Motion filed
11/30/1944Response to Motion filed
11/29/1944Motion to Argue filed
11/29/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/31/1944Brief on the Merits
05/31/1944Miscellaneous Motion
05/17/1944Submission reset
05/10/1944Bond
05/03/1944Document received (See Remarks)
04/25/1944Response to Petition
04/15/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/15/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. D. McCall, et al.Respondent
Alpine Telephone CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information