Case: B-4701
B-4701
06/12/1974
Application for Writ of Error
CARMEN R. MITCHIM
CHARLES F. MITCHIM
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/31/1974 | Letter brief | Respondent | | |
10/21/1974 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
06/28/1974 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
06/12/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/08/1975 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/31/1974 | Letter brief | | ||
10/21/1974 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
07/17/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/17/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/17/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
07/17/1974 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/28/1974 | Response to Petition | | ||
06/12/1974 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Charles F. Mitchim | Respondent | |
Carmen R. Mitchim | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information